EGLISE PROTESTANTE DE LONDRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching and teaching of the gospel of Christ Feeding the poor Promoting healthy style of life through education Counselling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 16 March 2015: Standard registration
- E.P.L. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN FABIEN ESENGO KASONGO BUYANGA | Chair | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nsimba Mikaloukidi A. | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hervee Ndombele | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mena leonie Djuma | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | £2.00k | £4.60k | £9.20k | £9.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.92k | £2.30k | £4.50k | £9.99k | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 27 October 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF; 2. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR LIVING THROUGHOUT LONDON EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Tudor Road
LONDON
N9 8PA
- Phone:
- 07466518635
- Email:
- eprotestante@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window