Accounts and annual returns BURNLEY WOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1161390
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not submitted