THORNTON LODGE ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in one of Huddersfield most deprived areas working with local residents to address gaps and services in the local community. The Action Group feeds its regeneration priorities into four broad strands: Education & Training - Employment support and Community Courses Health and Wellbeing - walking groups, exercise sessions, talking groups Sports and Recreation Environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,200 from 1 government contract(s) and £259,532 from 12 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 13 May 2015: CIO registration
- TLAG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBRAR HUSSAIN | Chair | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhammed W Bajwa | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHAHANA ALI | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
NAEEM JAMIL | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.20k | £239.23k | £222.34k | £281.49k | £291.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.01k | £147.29k | £174.42k | £193.06k | £217.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.42k | £13.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £102.17k | £143.11k | £36.52k | £58.47k | £259.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 May 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT; 3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; 4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; AND 5) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS IN THORNTON LODGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF HUDDERSFIELD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN THORNTON LODGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF HUDDERSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornton Lodge Action Group
10 Church Street
Paddock
Huddersfield
HD1 4TR
- Phone:
- 07530092821
- Email:
- ibrar@tactiongroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window