Financial history GERMAN CHOIR OF LONDON

Charity number: 1162894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.28k £19.68k £13.20k £38.21k £20.04k
Total expenditure £36.73k £19.51k £12.60k £56.48k £26.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A