Financial history MALMESBURY SKATE PARK GROUP

Charity number: 1161210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.35k £72 £308 £998 £1.55k
Total expenditure £736 £60 £1.08k £801 £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A