MALMESBURY SKATE PARK GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Malmesbury Skate Park Group was created to build, maintain and run the indoor community skateboard park, in Malmesbury Wiltshire , UK, its mission is also to promote skateboarding as a healthy activity for all ages. It is also to promote the skate park and skateboarding within our community as something really positive, creative and worthwhile investment of time, energy and money.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 April 2015: CIO registration
- MSPG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WIGLEY | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dimbylow | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALAN HOLT | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gina Tiplady | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £72 | £308 | £998 | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £736 | £60 | £1.08k | £801 | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Apr 2015 as amended on 26 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MALMESBURY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR A COMMUNITY SKATE-PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Radnor Park
Corston
MALMESBURY
SN16 0HE
- Phone:
- 07984743796
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window