Trustees HAWKHURST U3A

Charity number: 1160653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Langridge Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Ann Wood Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Vikki Thompson Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Bridget Veitch Trustee 04 March 2024
THOMAS ADRIAN VEITCH MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
KATHERINE ELISABETH WOOD CHARITY
Received: On time
Bridget Thomas Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Anne Metcalf Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Patrick Thomson Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Annie Watsham Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Roderick Cheesman Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record
Marie Thomas Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
JUDY WYCHERLEY Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Lyn Beverley Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record