Financial history HONOR OAK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.67k £77.74k £61.10k £64.16k £59.71k
Total expenditure £57.57k £47.63k £77.04k £73.57k £69.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.04k £4.84k N/A N/A