Financial history HEAD2HEAD THEATRE

Charity number: 1161873
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £134.91k £152.45k £237.00k £180.80k £326.71k
Total expenditure £77.35k £134.57k £144.79k £179.19k £254.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.55k £28.19k £56.17k £11.30k £124.34k