HEAD2HEAD THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A volunteer-led charity dedicated to the special needs' community providing accessible, multi-sensory theatre for children/young people with learning & physical disabilities that they may enjoy with their families. We tour SE England & provide virtual & online activities throughout the UK. A Work Experience Programme is offered to students transitioning from UK special schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £124,335 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 May 2015: CIO registration
- H2H (Working name)
- H2H Sensory Theatre (Working name)
- HEAD2HEAD SENSORY THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Lythan Rhodes | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Clarke | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Demetria Brigida Catalina O'Sullivan | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akbar Khurshid Khan | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN EDWARD SCHOLEFIELD MA OXON | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.91k | £152.45k | £237.00k | £180.80k | £326.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.35k | £134.57k | £144.79k | £179.19k | £254.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.55k | £28.19k | £56.17k | £11.30k | £124.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 May 2015 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
3) The object of the CIO is to relieve the needs of persons of all ages with special educational needs and disabilities (SEND) by means of the arts, in particular but not exclusively the art of music, drama and dance. Where consistent with the aforesaid aims, the charity will also support local and disadvantaged communities.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Drewshearne Barn
Crowhurst Lane End
Oxted
Surrey
RH8 9NT
- Phone:
- 01883 725264
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window