TYDD ST MARY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works for the public benefit having as its objects the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age, promoting their education, care and safety, their health and wellbeing, promoting parental involvement, providing support to them, their families and carers and supporting the training of individuals working within the pre-school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £26,836 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 May 2015: Standard registration
- 04 May 2021: Funds received from 1076313 SUNBEAMS (SUTTON BRIDGE)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRENDA MARGARET FURSSE | Chair | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Caron Marie Bishop | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shula Onions | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah May Lilley | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Beverly Groves | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.41k | £46.85k | £28.00k | £25.24k | £34.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.50k | £37.87k | £41.85k | £35.85k | £32.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.30k | £32.99k | £25.68k | £20.06k | £26.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2015 as amended on 02 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; AND (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THE TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS WORKING WITHIN THE PRESCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TYDD ST MARY PRE-SCHOOL
Trafford House
Common Way
Tydd St. Mary
WISBECH
PE13 5QH
- Phone:
- 01945420331
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window