Financial history DIVINE CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1164825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £13.23k £13.23k £23.52k £14.96k £16.17k
Total expenditure £12.30k £12.35k £21.41k £16.34k £17.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A