DIVINE CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL. WE PROVIDE MEANINGFUL TIMES OF WORSHIP AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR FELLOWSHIP FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, THROUGH SUNDAY SCHOOL, YOUTH GROUP, SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB, , SUMMER HOLIDAY CLUB. SEMINARS FOR MEN & WOMEN COVERING VARIOUS TOPICS INCLUDING DOMESTIC ABUSE, FINANCE AND HEALTH ISSUES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GIFT BENNETH | Chair | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIRY JOYCE ONYENKWU | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIANNA BENNETH | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £13.23k | £23.52k | £14.96k | £16.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.30k | £12.35k | £21.41k | £16.34k | £17.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 November 2022 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/12/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND MATERIAL TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 29
The Lindales
Grasmere Road
London
N17 0HE
- Phone:
- 0745609966
- Email:
- Divinechristm@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window