Empowering Kids in Kenya

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empowering Kids in Kenya provides secondary school education to the poorest of the poor children in the Bombolulu suburb of Mombasa, Kenya. Only children who cannot afford an education are accepted into the school. They are charged no fees, no charge for uniforms nor food. Without the generosity of child sponsors and supporters, these children would not be able to attend this exceptional school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 31 March 2015: CIO registration
- 14 November 2024: Funds received from 1045068 THE KENYAN ORPHAN SPONSORSHIP TRUST
- LITTLE FACES SCHOOLS, KENYA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY DIANE SEARLE | Chair | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN PEROSE | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEN CLAY | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GRAHAM | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BRYANS | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE JOHNSON | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.76k | £64.70k | £66.09k | £82.02k | £175.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.04k | £51.76k | £60.84k | £67.44k | £174.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION DATED REGISTERED ON 31 MAR 2015 AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN MOMBASA AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AT BOMBOLULU SECONDARY SCHOOL FOR EDUCATION AND WORK EXPERIENCE TRAINING AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 WILLINGTON ROAD
COPLE
BEDFORD
MK44 3TN
- Phone:
- 07851711622
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window