HULLBRIDGE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The University of the Third Age is a UK wide movement which brings together individuals who are retired or semi retired to develop their interests and continue their learning in a friendly and informal environment. It is all voluntary with many activity groups covering hundreds of different subjects. There are no qualifications to pass- it is just for pleasure. Many towns have a U3A .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 23 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Latcham | Chair | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Orme | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Schulz | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Perry | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Cooper | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Williams | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Crowley | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Samson | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Bentley | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Wright | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN POMFRETT | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN WATSON-JONES | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|||||
John Stanley Pomfrett | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/03/2020 | 27/03/2021 | 27/03/2022 | 27/03/2023 | 27/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.65k | £5.09k | £4.43k | £9.31k | £1.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | £5.09k | £8.48k | £8.58k | £10.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 March 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 March 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 EASTVIEW DRIVE
RAYLEIGH
SS6 9NY
- Phone:
- 01268782268
- Email:
- STEVECROWLEY001@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window