Financial history FRIENDS OF THE FRIARAGE

Charity Number: 1160941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £225.92k £314.03k £271.53k £216.54k £534.65k
Total expenditure £204.72k £238.95k £691.13k £298.08k £257.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £297.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £218.58k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.54k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £693
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £286.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £36.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £220.58k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0