ALLIANCE FOR TRANSATLANTIC THEOLOGICAL TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recruitment and training of future church leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- United States
Governance
- 29 May 2015: CIO registration
- AT3 (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBERT MARTIN ANGUS | Chair | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rhonda Kay OBrien | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Round | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tommy Kiedis | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dennis McMains | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.91k | £35.54k | £56.18k | £125.92k | £22.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.75k | £38.27k | £38.32k | £54.73k | £75.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING, PLANTING OF CHURCHES, HOLDING OF LECTURES AND MEETINGS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alliance for Transatlantic Theological Training
12-14 Gildart Street
LIVERPOOL
L3 8ET
- Phone:
- 07401550404
- Email:
- ken@at-3.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window