Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SKELMANTHORPE TEXTILE HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1162313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 May 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 May 2024 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window