THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE EDGBASTON BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1161342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian worship and outreach activities to the local community and further afield; open to all ages, creeds and cultures. Our main ministry is within the Birmingham area particularly that of the city centre.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 2015: Previously excepted registration
  • 30 October 2024: Funds received from 261968 INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN FILMS LIMITED
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST LUKE'S EDGBASTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Hughes Chair 06 September 2015
None on record
Paul Derek Nelson Trustee 08 December 2024
None on record
Darlene Cons Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Rev Peter James Norris Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Dr Daniel Joseph Richard Lonergan Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Rev James Joseph Leavy Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
William John McKemey Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Dr Ifeoluwa Adebola Bodunde Obakin Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Mountford Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Lucy Jane Cavell Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Keith Lumonga Kaselampao Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Joshua James Wilson Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Sophie Jasmine Crew Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Rev Michael Nicolas Darbandi Trustee 25 June 2022
None on record
Dr Oliver Isaac Griffith Snelling Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Gavin Darman Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Prof Nicholas John Harding Trustee 25 May 2022
VINEYARD CHURCHES UK AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Mamfuka Chilengwe Trustee 25 May 2022
THE ORCHARD WOMEN
Recently registered
Rev Dr Nicholas James Drake Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Rev Alison Elizabeth Herbert Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Rev Dr Katharine Victoria Hannah Stock Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Akhil Bakul Shah Trustee 21 October 2020
THE ERNEST MASON YOUTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
James Bird Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Francis James Harper Trustee 29 April 2019
KINGS CROSS CHURCH
Received: On time
Hannah Louise Miller Trustee 29 April 2019
KUJUWA INITIATIVE
Received: On time
Dr Henry William Rattle Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jonathan Rupert Mark Pearson Trustee 17 April 2016
THE REUBEN TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.10m £1.03m £1.28m £2.06m £1.93m
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.04m £1.25m £1.77m £2.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.20k £15.86k £800 £13.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £860.54k £810.22k £949.86k £1.51m £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £88.50k £16.77k £36.17k £93.23k £80.74k
Income - Charitable activities £97.90k £20.05k £43.13k £115.33k £261.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.27k £11.06k £10.83k £13.02k £7.00k
Income - Other £43.65k £169.71k £237.67k £335.69k £395.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.03m £1.25m £1.77m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £3.30k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.80k £9.99k £7.20k £0 £9.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £60.50k £14.00k £52.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £724.76k £651.04k £725.93k £691.81k £1.37m
Long-term investments £538.83k £560.45k £612.00k £614.98k £0
Other assets £507.41k £563.10k £514.40k £819.62k £721.67k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £848.73k £839.01k £838.63k £764.35k £936.42k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gas Street Church
Great Colmore Street
BIRMINGHAM
B15 2AT
Phone:
01216432795