THE JOHN BANNER SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Scholarship Grants, financial support and prizes for college and university students, within the East Midlands region, intent on a career in the Hospitality Industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 20 January 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NICK ROBINSON FIH MBA FRSPH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW POWIS FIH FCSI | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE RAWLINS FIH | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEAN NEWMAN FIH | Trustee | 19 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PRATT FIH B ED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.13k | £222 | £97 | £147 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £243 | £43 | £501 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE EAST MIDLANDS PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON, OR ENGAGED IN THE HOTEL AND CATERING INDUSTRY BY THE PROVISION OF ANNUAL SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES FOR PROFICIENCY IN CATERING.
Area of benefit
EAST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 LINK ROAD
ANSTEY
LEICESTER
LE7 7BW
- Phone:
- 01162219832
- Email:
- nickrobinson1954@gmail.com
- Website:
-
johnbannerfund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window