BRIDGING THE GAP ISLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridging the Gap lslington offers trained, supervised volunteer mentors to provide support to people at risk of offending including people who are homeless or addicted to help them to achieve specific short term goals along their chosen path to a more constructive and participative life. We operate in North London, in the area around Islington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,020 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 15 July 2015: CIO registration
- Bridging the Gap Mentoring (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN LATIMER | Chair | 15 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Lee Wakefield | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Cllr Ruth Hayes | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Sharmila Rajaratnam | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
GREG FOXSMITH | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.94k | £12.50k | £20.09k | £20.33k | £29.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £8.33k | £19.48k | £21.50k | £21.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS, BY OFFERING OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND PEOPLE AT RISK OF OFFENDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT, INCLUDING TO ADDRESS THEIR NEEDS AND PROMOTE THEIR INTEGRATION INTO THE WIDER LAW-ABIDING COMMUNITY , WORKING TOGETHER WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR AIMS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A VOLUNTARY MENTORING SERVICE FOR PEOPLE AT RISK OF OFFENDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 TOLLINGTON WAY
LONDON
N7 6RG
- Phone:
- 07956440309
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window