South Bank Sanctuary Church of the Nazarene

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer teaching around the Christian faith and a place for worship. We run a youth ministry for loacl children which is new, and we run a Community Craft Cafe, a free drop in place for creative work and a place to meet for coffee. The Church has more than 100 years history here in Beeston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £2,150 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 30 March 2015: CIO registration
- SOUTH LEEDS CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Joel Lynam | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Afomia Tsegai | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Montgomery | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Alker | Trustee | 22 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Jones | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Rayner | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ALKER | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.47k | £99.81k | £111.06k | £137.07k | £155.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.47k | £98.99k | £111.11k | £116.02k | £164.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.38k | £12.10k | N/A | £2.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Mar 2015 as amended on 16 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH BANK SANCTUARY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
2 HUNSLET HALL ROAD
LEEDS
LS11 6TT
- Phone:
- 01132254975
- Email:
- southbanksanctuary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window