Trustees DOUBLE R ARTS
Charity number: 1165997

Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Patten | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Newsham | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Newsham | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Young | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Maria Adamson | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN DEVERILL | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
IRENE ELIZABETH MOORE | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.