Financial history THE MEADOWS COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1160852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £91.49k £101.45k £88.98k £88.64k £92.05k
Total expenditure £79.16k £91.77k £88.41k £85.00k £94.19k
Income from government contracts N/A £80.78k £72.75k £77.03k £60.97k
Income from government grants N/A £11.31k £3.50k N/A £210