UMBRELLA CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENDER AND SEXUAL DIVERSITY, EQUALITY AND INCLUSION SPECIALIST SUPPORT SERVICE IN WALES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £81,571 from 1 government contract(s) and £82,948 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2015: CIO registration
- UMBRELLA GWENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NICK LEWIS MSC | Chair | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Amy Powell | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Miles Thorne | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Robinson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.36k | £176.58k | £174.46k | £170.80k | £263.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.60k | £129.96k | £166.42k | £185.81k | £221.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £52.53k | £78.42k | £78.80k | £93.80k | £81.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.60k | £92.49k | £71.13k | £61.20k | £82.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2022 | 604 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2022 | 604 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAR 2015 AMENDED ON 19 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: (1) TO ADVANCE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR, FOSTER GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN, AND ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION EXPERIENCED BY, PEOPLE WHO IDENTIFY AS/WITH A ?MINORITY CHARACTERISTIC? IN RELATION TO THE PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS OF ?SEXUAL ORIENTATION? AND ?GENDER REASSIGNMENT? AS DESCRIBED IN THE EQUALITY ACT (2010) BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) PROVIDING INFORMATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, TO ANYONE (EITHER IN A PERSONAL OR PROFESSIONAL CAPACITY) WHO LIVES, WORKS, OR HAS CONNECTIONS WITHIN WALES. (B) ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY EQUALITY. (C) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF ?THE COMMUNITY? INSOFAR AS THEIR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED STATUS, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (D) PERFORMING OR PROMOTING OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PURSUANCE OF THE CIO?S PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Innovation and Technology Centre
Tredomen Park
Ystrad Mynach
HENGOED
Mid Glamorgan
CF82 7FN
- Phone:
- 03003023670
- Email:
- info@umbrellacymru.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window