ENSEMBLE MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training for French tutors with inbuilt placements. Volunteering opportunities for young people Generations Cooking Together (Grand Kitchen) French Supplementary School Sign posting and advocacy support for individuals and families of French African heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £21,167 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 29 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacques Kamwa | Chair | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nogaya Faye | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Bangoura | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Fotsing | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Djomou Ngonji | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Tilley | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dany Njiadeu | Trustee | 16 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.06k | £47.18k | £33.10k | £48.93k | £36.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.63k | £74.05k | £32.09k | £47.43k | £38.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.78k | £21.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF FRENCH AFRICAN CULTURE AND HERITAGE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND CULTURAL EVENTS. 2)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE FRENCH AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN MANCHESTER BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3)TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE FRENCH AFRICAN COMMUNITY OF MANCHESTER IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES, ADVOCACY AND SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
342 OLDHAM ROAD
MANCHESTER
M40 7NS
- Phone:
- 07447980526
- Email:
- info@ensemblemanchester.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window