B LAB (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT & BUSINESS & PROMOTE ITS STUDY.TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT OF: PRESERVATION & PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES & PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ECONOMIC GROWTH. TO PROMOTE ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT & MAXIMISE THE POSITIVE IMPACT & MINIMISE THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF BUSINESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£6,528,171
Donations and legacies | £750 | |
Charitable activities | £6.50m | |
Other trading activities | £7.00k | |
Investments | £21.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,264,366
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.26m | |
Retained for future use | £1.26m |
People

33 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anuradha Chugh | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Murray | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jolyon Kenrick | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clark | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
George King | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Johnstone-Louis | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Louise Mary Elizabeth Harman | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £847.49k | £1.21m | £1.62m | £3.42m | £6.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £758.83k | £1.01m | £1.76m | £3.69m | £5.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £126 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £55.01k | £291.20k | £33.43k | £687 | £750 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £52.37k | £0 | £0 | £85.50k | £7.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £740.11k | £919.14k | £1.59m | £3.33m | £6.50m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £788 | £21.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £758.83k | £1.01m | £1.76m | £3.69m | £5.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.47k | £10.47k | £34.68k | £61.72k | £56.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £97.52k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.10k | £4.96k | £8.94k | £22.89k | £34.82k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £807.88k | £1.17m | £1.69m | £2.98m | £6.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £557.33k | £719.62k | £1.39m | £2.96m | £4.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2015 as amended on 04 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND SUSTAINABLE BUSINESS AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. (2) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. (3) TO PROMOTE COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW AND ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY ENCOURAGING THE ADOPTION AND APPLICATION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF BUSINESS ETHICS AND GOVERNANCE AND THEREBY; A. MAXIMISING THE MATERIAL POSITIVE IMPACT OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES; AND B. MINIMISING THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2 HUGUENOT PLACE
17 Heneage Street
LONDON
E1 5LN
- Phone:
- 02071934644
- Email:
- governance@bcorporation.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window