TOCKWITH AND WILSTROP RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports and Recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 January 1977: Standard registration
- TOCKWITH SPORTSFIELD TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE CORBETT | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey William Wilson | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Joseph Harrison | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Albrow Vaughan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Dyason | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SWIRES | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Marston | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE CORBETT | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|||||
DERYCK RICHARD WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.07k | £21.94k | £11.92k | £3.97k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.75k | £8.38k | £5.17k | £5.71k | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.93k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TOCKWITH AND WILSTROP.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TOCKWITH AND WILSTROP
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 KENDAL GARDENS
TOCKWITH
YORK
YO26 7QR
- Phone:
- 07767143931
- Email:
- tockypearsons@msn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window