Trustees TOCKWITH AND WILSTROP RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 505845

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE CORBETT | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey William Wilson | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Joseph Harrison | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Albrow Vaughan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Dyason | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SWIRES | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Marston | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE CORBETT | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|||||
DERYCK RICHARD WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.