TAVISTOCK SCRAPSTORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tavistock Scrapstore provides low-cost scrap materials collected from business as a creative resource and inspires individual and group creativity in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,025 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Blackmore | Chair | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN LANGTON | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SUSAN HITCHCOCK | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vanda Alaoui | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.10k | £7.81k | £13.09k | £8.66k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.06k | £6.73k | £7.36k | £8.43k | £13.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | £5.74k | £5.62k | N/A | £2.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ARTS AND CRAFTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) FACILITATING THE USE AND PROVISION OF RECYCLED, SCRAP OR SURPLUS MATERIALS AS A CREATIVE RESOURCE TO ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING; AND BY B) INSPIRING INDIVIDUAL AND GROUP CREATIVITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ENVIRONMENT. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROMOTING RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS OR SCRAP; AND BY B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT WASTE RECYCLING AND USE OF SURPLUS OR SCRAP.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tavistock Scrapstore
1-3 Farriers Court
Paddons Row
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0HF
- Phone:
- 01822489200
- Email:
- pblackmore1234@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window