LEEDS BRAMLEY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Christian worship meetings. Work with the elderly & people with disabilities. Partner local agencies. Continue to develop links with the local community through services & meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Whitley | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Penny | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Stephenson | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PATRICK MARSH | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE LOUISE HANSON | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.76k | £9.71k | £6.99k | £16.36k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £6.39k | £3.42k | £3.69k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
C/O 4 Church Hill Mount
Stanningley
Pudsey
LS28 6LL
- Phone:
- 07759533169
- Email:
- elainewaring@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window