GIFT FOR AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?Developing and implementing community-level initiatives on issues and conditions relating socio-economic disadvantaged communities. ?Delivering community health education and assistance to relieve sickness and preserve and protect the good health of the public. ?Supporting projects that alleviate poverty, improving wellbeing, improve food security and access to clean water and sanitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ernest Rukangira | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|||||
EDOUARD BAREBERAHO | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIREILLE KENA CIAMALA | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 597 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 597 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2024 | 962 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2024 | 962 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
A. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFRICA AND UK BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; B. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFRICA AND UK BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE, WATER AND SANITATION PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT, AND BY ASSISTING THOSE AT RISK OF HUNGER AND MALNUTRITION AND BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FOOD; C. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; D. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN AFRICA AND UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, VACCINE, SUPPORT, ADVOCACY, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. E. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, INTERNALLY DISPLACED PEOPLE (DUE TO CONFLICTS OR DISASTERS) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES SUCH AS ADVOCACY, HEALTH, HOUSING, ADVICE AND EDUCATION; F. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN AFRICA AND UK IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. G. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HELPING TO CONTROL INFECTION SUCH AS EBOLA, POLIO, TB, AND MALARIA, HIV/AIDS, SEXUAL TRANSMITTED INFECTIONS, AND OTHER INFECTIOUS DISEASES AND NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES. H. SUCH OTHER MEANS THAT FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Georges Chambers
23
South Mall
London
- Phone:
- 03001237594
- Email:
- info.gfa@giftforafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window