Trustees CALPE HOUSE LIMITED
Charity number: 1161889

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALBERT POGGIO OBE GMH | Chair | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sir Lindsay Hoyle MP | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|||||
James Andrew Noguera LLB LLM | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jose Julio Pisharello FCCA GMD | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anita Jane Huxley | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Ian Andrew McGhie MA FCMI RN | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD LOUIS YOME QPM CPM | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES JOHN NEISH KC | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE DESOISA | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.