HOPE RESTORED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope Restored provides services for the relief of poverty to those in financial hardship including the homeless and those in need. Our main activities include the provision of hot meals and drinks, snacks, food parcels, clothing, accommodation, equipment, social interaction and other support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
Governance
- 30 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Hewitt | Chair | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Gareth Williams | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brown | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Nothard | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harvey Fogg | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.69k | £49.74k | £41.96k | £38.67k | £67.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.43k | £29.75k | £22.21k | £51.66k | £50.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS (II) THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Bryn Y Bia Heights
Bryn Y Bia Road
LLANDUDNO
Gwynedd
LL30 3BF
- Phone:
- 07564991789
- Email:
- hoperestoredwales@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window