INCLUSION HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1162711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Inclusion Hampshire supports disadvantaged young people within the local community. It operates as an Independent Special School in Basingstoke for young people aged 11-16 with SEN and mental health needs and, a College based in Hook which specialises in providing mental health support for young people that are aged 16 and over.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Minshull-Beech Chair 22 April 2014
None on record
Melanie Dimple Roberts Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Toni Shaw Trustee 30 January 2024
BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE COMMUNITY LEISURE TRUST
Received: On time
THIRD HOUSE
Received: 46 days late
Matthew Russell Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Lesley Jane Pratt Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £471.74k £614.02k £879.94k £2.25m £3.53m
Total expenditure £334.03k £460.41k £839.61k £2.07m £3.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £369.42k £379.68k
Income from government grants N/A £42.64k £10.00k £10.00k £151.10k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £46.50k £48.34k £23.06k £305.69k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £5.08k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £534.82k £825.81k £2.21m £3.20m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £484 £1.32k £4.48k £24.03k
Income - Other N/A £32.22k £1.47k £120 £2.01k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £460.41k £839.61k £2.07m £3.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £27.28k £23.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A £203.71k £111.08k £549.39k £556.36k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £507.11k £612.27k £1.02m £1.50m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £228.20k £204.96k £872.88k £882.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
INCLUSION EDUCATION
Jays Close
Viables
Basingstoke
HAMPSHIRE
RG22 4BS
Phone:
01256760800