ARK OF HOPE FOUNDATION FOR ALL NATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity Objects: AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH, TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, PARTICULARLY AMONG WOMEN FROM BAME BACKGROUNDS, REFUGEES, AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH SAFE ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT FOR VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, CULTURALLY COMPETENT FOOD BANK FOR FAMILIES, COUNSELING, EDUCATION, TO RELIEVE WOMEN SURFFERING FROM HOMELESSNESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 April 2015: CIO registration
- ARK OF HOPE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Segun Ayo Fapetu | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Ijaseun | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ADELOA ADESEWA NEWBOULD | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ADEFOLAHAN HINDS | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.09k | £22.79k | £11.25k | £10.00k | £27.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £17.46k | £10.90k | £10.08k | £13.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Apr 2015 as amended on 13 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH AND VALUES, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION; WHO ARE HOMELESS OR ON THE VERGE OF BEING MADE HOMELESS; THOSE TRAPPED IN PROSTITUTION OR THE SEX TRADE OR THOSE THAT HAVE BEEN IMPRISONED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 4954
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 9RW
- Phone:
- 07956120599
- Email:
- Info@arkofhopefoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window