Financial history RADIO YSBYTY GLAN CLWYD

Charity number: 505862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.02k £37 £465 £1.50k £1.79k
Total expenditure £1.93k £1.45k £5.96k £5.12k £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A