Governing document RADIO YSBYTY GLAN CLWYD
Charity number: 505862

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 4 MAY 1977, 5 MAY 1978, 5 MAY 1982, 7 MAY 1986, 26 JUNE 1996 AND 16 JUNE 1999..
Charitable objects
TO HELP RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND THE EFFECTS OF OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE NORTH EAST WALES AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CLWYD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.