BABA KASSIM SHAH FARIDI CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the principles of Islam and Sufism as understood and promulgated by Hadrat Baba Fariduddin Ganj Shakar and Hadrat Baba Kassim Shah Faridi in the United Kingdom and globally for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals, producing and/or distributing literature on Islam and Sufism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
- South Africa
Governance
- 28 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD ZAHEER CASSIM | Chair | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BALAL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|||||
LAL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 01 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 01 January 2025 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION GENERALLY AND THE PRINCIPLES OF SUFISM IN PARTICULAR AS UNDERSTOOD AND PROMULGATED BY: A) HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT SHAIKH ABDAL QADIR JILANI (RADIALLAHU ANHU) B) HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT KHWAJA MUINUDDIN HASAN CHISHTI (RADIALLAHU ANHU) C) HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT BABA FARIDUDDIN GANJ SHAKAR (RADIALLAHU ANHU) D) HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT KHWAJA NIZAMUDDIN AULIA (RADIALLAHU ANHU) E) HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT MAKHDOOM BABA KASSIM SHAH FARIDI (RAHIMULLAH) F) HIS SERENE MAJESTY MUJJADID SHAH AHMED RAZA KHAN (RAHIMAHULLAH); G) HIS SERENE MAJESTY MUJJADID SIRHINDI ALIFTHAANI (RAHIMAHULLAH); H) HIS SERENE EXCELLENCY SHAYKH ABDUL HAQ MUHADDITH DEHLVI (RAHIMULLAH), IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND GLOBALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND SUFISM IN ORDER TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND SUFISM. 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM AND SUFISM AS UNDERSTOOD AND PROMULGATED BY THE PERSONS MENTIONED IN PARAGRAPH 1 ABOVE, ON MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING ISLAMIC MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
238 RADFORD BOULEVARD
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 5QG
- Phone:
- 07961312865
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
notdonethis.stage
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window