Financial history PERTH GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1160536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £212.69k £198.26k £356.68k £357.58k £377.01k
Total expenditure £196.85k £111.97k £325.54k £239.91k £295.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £53.53k N/A N/A N/A