PERTH GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1160536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of South Tyneside and the neighbourhood without distinction. As well as a Football Association registered pitch, we also offer a wide range of room and facilities for community hire and use. The centre also offers a range of organised activities open and accessible to the whole community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £377,013
Total expenditure: £295,507

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • South Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 2015: CIO registration
  • 27 April 2015: Funds received from 1042892 PERTH GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES PETER KANE Chair 01 April 2015
None on record
Stephen Dean Trustee 03 January 2019
SOUTH TYNESIDE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
KEVIN MULLEN Trustee 04 June 2016
None on record
June Elizabeth Gardiner Gardiner Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £212.69k £198.26k £356.68k £357.58k £377.01k
Total expenditure £196.85k £111.97k £325.54k £239.91k £295.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £53.53k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 August 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 August 2024 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Perth Green Community Association
Inverness Road
Jarrow
NE32 4AQ
Phone:
01914893743