SPECIAL KIDS BEXHILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise activities, to enable children and young adults (up to and including 25 years old) with special needs and their families and siblings, to access activities and have fun within a supportive environment during the school holidays. We organise activities that our members may otherwise not feel comfortable attending alone. We provide exclusive hire activities and coach trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.30k | £43.44k | £63.12k | £39.01k | £3.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.94k | £27.74k | £55.48k | £44.23k | £33.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WITHIN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITY SESSIONS, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, PEER SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SHARING OF EXPERIENCES AMONG PARENTS AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window