EMMA DORIS BUSSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This year the trustees have been able to grant all legitimate requests for grants to help people in the old borough of Bilston which despite being part of Wolverhampton is an active and thriving town in its own right.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 January 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN REANEY | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARY GENTLE | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN SIMKINS | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Balvant Dahyabhai Unka Patel | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PAGE | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.70k | £15.61k | £20.89k | £21.50k | £24.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.60k | £19.75k | £29.22k | £32.44k | £34.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ARE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BILSTON: (A) AGED AND OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (B) AGED AND OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM, WHERE SUCH RELIEF IS NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 22 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF BILSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 QUAIL GREEN
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 8DF
- Phone:
- 01902764131
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window