FRAMTASTICS GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Framtastics Gymnastics Club is to provide facilities for and to promote participation in the amateur sport of gymnastics in South Norfolk to children of school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Greenhouse | Chair | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PERRY | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Loades | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toni-Marrie Smith | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Phillips | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sutherland | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.52k | £10.05k | £27.98k | £32.22k | £36.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18k | £6.03k | £20.31k | £23.27k | £32.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUN 2012 ADOPTED 23/06/2012 as amended on 10 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
The aim of the Club is to provide facilities for and to promote participation in the amateur sport of Gymnastics in South Norfolk, to primarily children of school age.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Framingham Earl Sports Centre
Framingham Earl High School
Norwich Road
Framingham Earl
Norwich
NR14 7QP
- Phone:
- 07766884477
- Email:
- coach@framearlgym.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window