YABONGA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the prevention and relief of sickness, disease and human suffering and the preservation of health; the advancement of education;the prevention and relief of poverty; and such other excusively charitable purposes as the trustees may from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 26 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr URSEL YVONNE BARNES | Chair | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Chanele Santana | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clodagh Curtis | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
EVE PATRICIA PEIN | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA JANE PRICE | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.61k | £22.92k | £3.91k | £32.30k | £243 | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.28k | £812 | £412 | £915 | £55.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE AND HUMAN SUFFERING AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND (D) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wheathold Place
Wheathold
Wolverton
Tadley
RG26 5SA
- Phone:
- 07969167010
- Email:
- uk@yabonga.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window