KENYA WILDLIFE TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity currently operates in Kenya. We provide funding and make grants 1. for community projects which help the people work in harmony with their wildlife 2. to support new and existing respected predator projects 3. to work with community partners to ensure the survival of wildlife, especially predators 4. to provide educational scholarships to develop conservation leaders at all levels
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 22 July 2015: CIO registration
- 25 November 2015: Funds received from 1148496 FRIENDS OF KENYA WILDLIFE TRUST UK
- THE FRIENDS OF KENYA WILDLIFE TRUST UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HUGH TUITE | Chair | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CAROLINE CULLEN | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
ROBIN NEVILLE CULLEN | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rosa Wark Prins | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £17.68k | £18.05k | £7.51k | £10.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £19.81k | £7.34k | £12.00k | £286 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jul 2015 as amended on 21 Jan 2021 as amended on 13 Feb 2021 as amended on 26 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN THE REPUBLIC OF KENYA(“KENYA”)”.
Area of benefit
IN THE REPUBLIC OF KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6a Reeves Lane
Wing
OAKHAM
LE15 8SD
- Phone:
- 01572737544
- Email:
- FoKWTUK@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window