ASK ERWIN: ADVOCACY SUPPORT KNOWLEDGE / EMPOWERING RIGHTS WHEN IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVOCACY, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO PEOPLE WHO HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, DISABILITIES OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 May 2015: CIO registration
- ASK ERWIN (Previous name)
- ASK ERWIN: ADVOCACY SUPPORT KNOWLEDGE / EMPOWERING RIGHTS WHEN LN NEED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Donohoe | Chair | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suneil Saraf | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/05/2020 | 14/05/2021 | 14/05/2022 | 14/05/2023 | 14/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £5.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £926 | £5.87k | £1.83k | £3.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 May 2020 | 15 March 2023 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2020 | 15 March 2023 | 731 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 May 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS WHO HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, DISABILITIES, OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ADVOCACY, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, PROJECTS, REPRESENTATION AND OTHER SERVICES B) HELPING THE PEOPLE LISTED ABOVE IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS C) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THOSE WHO CARE FOR THE PEOPLE LISTED ABOVE 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING SPECIFIC PROFESSIONAL AND OTHER GROUPS ABOUT THE NEEDS OF THE PEOPLE LISTED ABOVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROUND FLOOR 108 EVELINA RD
LONDON
SE15 3HL
- Phone:
- 0207 450 5442
- Email:
- info@askerwin.org
- Website:
-
askerwin.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window