LONDON VILLAGE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
L.V.N has a unique approach for social mobility, They encourage a village mentality wherein adults from all walks of life come together to nurture young people by giving their time to share knowledge and experience. L.V.N have created a series of assets-based micro-mentoring programmes putting networking at the centre; Amplify Me, One-2-One Online mentoring, work experience and signposting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £82,224 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 April 2015: CIO registration
- Local Village Network (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Rutherford | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denzol Cemeron | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Edwards | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cahalane | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Noel Williams | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ruggles | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Kirby | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dashika Alcee | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL BOX | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.68k | £106.78k | £161.50k | £219.48k | £263.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.67k | £105.99k | £121.58k | £165.92k | £209.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £48.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £80.58k | £45.00k | £82.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE NOT IN EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT OR TRAINING (NEETS), PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND MENTORING IN HOW TO ESTABLISH A SUCCESSFUL BUSINESS; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 42
Morgan Mansions
Morgan Road
London
N7 8NA
- Phone:
- 07943199814
- Email:
- knowmore@lvn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window