THE LILY ANN ROGERS PRIZES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 January 1977: Standard registration
- 18 April 2007: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- 18 April 2007: Funds transferred to 1115005 THE STANWELL (NORRIS) TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37 | £48 | £48 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37 | £48 | £48 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 20 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO AWARD YEARLY MONEY PRIZES, TO THE MOST OUTSTANDING PUPILS OF THE STANWELL COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1I OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window