VETS FOR CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vets for Change were established to support local communities, State organisations, NGOs and local charities with our specialist knowledge in organising, planning and executing vaccination and sterilisation campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Africa
Governance
- 12 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARL STEVEN SALTER | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISSY HOWELL | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANIS SALTER | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCY SAMANTHA CALLAWAY | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £24 | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 06 December 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 401 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DOGS IN SOUTH AFRICA BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF A FREE VETERINARY SERVICE TO UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES AND ORGANISING, PLANNING AND EXECUTING CANINE VACCINATION AND STERILISATION CAMPAIGNS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Oakland Avenue
Cheltenham
GL52 3EP
- Phone:
- 01242 262060
- Email:
- info@vetsforchange.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window